EP4176956 - FILTER MEDIUM FOR AIR FILTERS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hokuetsu Corporation 5-1 Nishizao 3-chome Nagaoka-shi Niigata 940-0027 / JP | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TASHIRO, Nozomi Nagaoka-shi, Niigata 940-0027 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Masashi Nagaoka-shi, Niigata 940-0027 / JP | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Ridlerstraße 57 80339 München / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 20942651.9 | 03.07.2020 | [2023/19] | WO2020JP26245 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022003965 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4176956 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/20, D21H13/40, D04H1/4218 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
D04H1/4218 (EP,KR,US);
B01D39/202 (KR,US);
B01J20/261 (US);
B01D39/2024 (EP);
B01J20/103 (US);
B01J20/28004 (US);
B01J20/2803 (US);
B01J20/28038 (US);
B01J20/3007 (US);
B01J20/3204 (US);
B01J20/3223 (US);
B01J20/3287 (US);
B01J20/3297 (US);
D04H1/587 (EP,US);
D04H1/64 (EP,US);
D04H1/732 (EP,US);
D21H13/40 (KR,US);
D21H17/44 (EP);
D21H19/12 (US);
D21H27/08 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0414 (US);
B01D2239/0428 (EP);
B01D2239/0618 (US);
B01D2239/064 (EP);
B01D2239/086 (EP);
B01D2239/10 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1233 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Title | German: | FILTERMEDIUM FÜR LUFTFILTER UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2023/19] | English: | FILTER MEDIUM FOR AIR FILTERS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2023/19] | French: | MILIEU FILTRANT POUR FILTRES À AIR ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SA PRODUCTION | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2022 | Translation filed | 25.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 31.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2010094580 (HOKUETSU KISHU PAPER CO LTD) [AD] 1-6 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0065]; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US2011147320 (SEALEY DAVID F [GB], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0099] ** paragraph [0106]; examples 1-9; claims 1-40 *; | [A]WO2014171165 (HOKUETSU KISHU PAPER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * examples 1, 2; claims 1-6 *; | [AD]JP2014221456 (HOKUETSU KISHU PAPER CO LTD) [AD] 1-6 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] * * examples 1, 2; claims 1-4 * | International search | [Y]JP2010094580 (HOKUETSU KISHU PAPER CO LTD) [Y] 1-6 * , claims 1-2, paragraphs [0020], [0034], [0036], examples *; | [Y]WO2014171165 (HOKUETSU KISHU PAPER CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5 * , claim 1, paragraph [0026] *; | [Y]JP2014221456 (HOKUETSU KISHU PAPER CO LTD) [Y] 1-6 * , claims 1-2, paragraphs [0015], [0017], [0019], [0020], example 2 *; | [A]JP2016097336 (NIKKI UNIVERSAL CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-6* , entire text * | by applicant | JP2010094580 | JP2014221456 | JP2017042762 | JP2018038983 |