EP4162480 - DISPLAY APPARATUS AND METHOD OF DRIVING DISAPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Masahide Osaka-shi Osaka 530--6106 / JP | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 20943029.7 | 02.07.2020 | [2023/15] | WO2020CN99979 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022000434 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4162480 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32, G06F3/042, G06V40/13, G06V10/145, G06V10/143 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
G06V40/1318 (EP,US);
G06V10/143 (EP,US);
G06V10/145 (EP);
G09G3/32 (US);
G09G2300/0842 (US);
G09G2380/08 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/15] | G09G3/32, G06F3/042, G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINER ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/15] | English: | DISPLAY APPARATUS AND METHOD OF DRIVING DISAPLAY APPARATUS | [2023/15] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 04.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2017214582 (INSYTE SYSTEMS [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2018157351 (LEE MING-JING [TW]) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0147] * * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0154] * * paragraph [0159] * * paragraph [0161] - paragraph [0162] * * paragraph [0168]; figures 1b,2b,4a * [I] 1-14; | [I]US2018357462 (MACKEY BOB LEE [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049] *; | [A]EP3599643 (PA COTTE FAMILY HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | International search | [A]CN101135794 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014071295 (MIESAK EDWARD JOZEF [US]) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [A]CN108122941 (NANCHANG OUFEI BIOLOGICAL IDENTIFICATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [Y]CN108154804 (EVERLIGHT ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [Y] 1-3,14-16 * description, paragraphs 0167 to 0187, figures 1A to 4C *; | [Y]CN109475328 (INSYTE SYSTEMS) [Y] 1-3,14-16 * description, paragraphs 0046 to 0060, figures 1 to 2 *; | [A]JP2020086749 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-26 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2018157351 | US2018357462 |