EP4156483 - INVERTER, AND INVERSION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Digital Power Technologies Co., Ltd. Office 01, 39th Floor, Block A Antuoshan Headquarters Towers 33 Antuoshan 6th Road Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518043 / CN | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Yongbing Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Dong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
SHI, Lei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 20943313.5 | 30.06.2020 | [2023/13] | WO2020CN99176 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022000248 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4156483 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/5387, H02M1/42, H02M1/32, H02M1/00, H02J3/38, H02K15/12, H01M10/667 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
H02M1/327 (EP,US);
H02M7/12 (US);
H02M1/0009 (US);
H02M1/0029 (US);
H02M1/0054 (EP);
H02M1/007 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/13] | H02M1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | WECHSELRICHTER UND UMKEHRSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2023/13] | English: | INVERTER, AND INVERSION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2023/13] | French: | ONDULEUR, ET SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ONDULATION | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2022 | Translation filed | 21.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 20.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003030154 (NAKAZAWA TAIBO [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0022]; figure 5 *; | [X]EP1993195 (ABB OY [FI]) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0010]; figure 4 *; | [A]DE102008035546 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0020]; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP2469601 (DIEHL AKO STIFTUNG GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 5,6,13,14,18,19 * paragraph [0032]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2013330578 (DOMEL BERNHARD [DE]) [Y] 5,6,13,14,18 * paragraph [0012]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2015348863 (DU MAOHUA [CN]) [A] 1-18* paragraph [0077]; figure 6 *; | [X]EP3236574 (REGAL BELOIT AMERICA INC [US]) [X] 1,10 * paragraphs [0020] , [0028]; figures 2,3 *; | [XY]CN107517010 (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG) [X] 1-3,7-11,15-17 * abstract * [Y] 4-6,12-14,18,19; | [Y]EP3534524 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 4,12 * paragraph [0053]; figures 2,4-6 *; | [Y]US2020052642 (KUROKI WATARU [JP]) [Y] 5,6,13,14,18 * paragraph [0037]; figures 1,3-5 * | International search | [X]CN201188195Y (NICRO STAR INTERNAT CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-19 * description page 2 lines 1-15, figures 1-4 *; | [X]CN101442864 (DELTA ELECTRONICS INC [CN]) [X] 1-19 * description page 1 line 7 to page 2 line 18, figures 1, 2 *; | [X]CN107919793 (MAIPU COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-19 * description paragraphs [0003], [0021]-[0041], figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN110277930 (STATE GRID CORP CHINA, et al) [A] 1-19* entire document * |