EP4179633 - METHODS, RADIO ACCESS NETWORK NODE AND WIRELESS DEVICE FOR HANDLING BEAMFORMING IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM ERICSSON (PUBL) 16483 Stockholm / SE | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAMMI, Sairamesh 164 80 Kista / SE | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 20943955.3 | 10.07.2020 | [2023/20] | WO2020SE50727 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022010394 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4179633 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0491, H04B7/0417, H04B7/06, H04W72/04, H04L5/00 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
H04B7/0639 (EP);
H04B7/0452 (US);
H04B7/0417 (US);
H04B7/0617 (US);
H04B7/063 (EP);
H04B7/0632 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/20] | H04B7/0491, H04B7/0417, H04B7/06, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, FUNKZUGANGSNETZWERKKNOTEN UND DRAHTLOSE VORRICHTUNG ZUR HANDHABUNG VON STRAHLFORMUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2023/20] | English: | METHODS, RADIO ACCESS NETWORK NODE AND WIRELESS DEVICE FOR HANDLING BEAMFORMING IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2023/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, NOEUD D'ACCÈS RADIO ET DISPOSITIF SANS FIL PERMETTANT DE GÉRER UNE FORMATION DE FAISCEAU DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 12.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2017045713 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [Y] 3* page 24, lines 26-30; figures 5, 8 *; | [XYI]US2019053213 (STIRLING-GALLACHER RICHARD [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10-15 * paragraphs [0033] - [0035] - [0 44] - [0047] - [0 69] - [0070] - [0 85] - [0086] - [ 101] - [0103] - [ 110] - [0113]; figures 1, 3-8 * [Y] 3,8,9 [I] 4; | [Y]US2020044704 (ZHANG YU [CN], et al) [Y] 8,9 * paragraphs [0117] , [ 131] , [ 150]; figures 23-27 * | International search | [A]WO2017045713 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [A] 1-36 * ; page 24, line 26 - line 30; figures 5,8 *; | [A]US2017346539 (ISLAM MUHAMMAD NAZMUL [US], et al) [A] 1-36* ; paragraphs [0094]-[0100]; figure 5 *; | [A]US2018351629 (NILSSON ANDREAS [SE], et al) [A] 1-36 * ; paragraph [0011]; figures 2-4; claim 1 *; | [XY]US2019053213 (STIRLING-GALLACHER RICHARD [US]) [X] 1-9, 11-25, 27- 36 * ; paragraphs [0044]-[0047], [0069], [0085], [0101], [0110], [0113]; figures 3-8 * [Y] 10, 26; | [YA]US2020044704 (ZHANG YU [CN], et al) [Y] 10, 26 * ; paragraphs [0150], [0131], [0117]; figures 23-25 * [A] 1-9, 11-25, 27-36; | [A]EP2868001 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-36 * ; paragraphs [0044]-[0049]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP3664541 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-36 * ; paragraphs [0014], [0018], [0064]-[0071]; figures 5-9 * | by applicant | US2019053213 |