EP4176794 - PROCESSING DEVICE, PROCESSING PROGRAM, PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aillis Inc. 7F, Yaesu Central Tower 2-2-1 Yaesu Chuo-ku Tokyo, 1040028 / JP | [2023/48] |
Former [2023/19] | For all designated states Aillis Inc. 11F Yuurakuchobiru 1-10-1 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA, Atsushi Tokyo, 1040028 / JP | 02 /
SODE, Masashi Tokyo, 1040028 / JP | 03 /
CAP, Huu Quan Tokyo, 1040028 / JP | 04 /
YASUMI, Takashi Tokyo, 1040028 / JP | [2023/48] |
Former [2023/19] | 01 /
FUKUDA Atsushi Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | ||
02 /
SODE Masashi Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | |||
03 /
CAP Huu Quan Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | |||
04 /
YASUMI Takashi Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/19] | Reeve, Nicholas Edward Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20943972.8 | 06.07.2020 | [2023/19] | WO2020JP26479 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022009285 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4176794 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/24, G06T5/73 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
A61B1/000096 (EP);
G06T5/73 (EP,US);
A61B1/000094 (EP);
A61B1/000095 (EP);
A61B1/24 (EP,US);
G06T3/4053 (US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G16H15/00 (US);
G16H30/40 (US);
H04N7/183 (US);
G06T2207/10068 (US);
G06T2207/20081 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30036 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/19] | A61B1/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM, VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/19] | English: | PROCESSING DEVICE, PROCESSING PROGRAM, PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2023/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT, PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT, ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2023 | Translation filed | 13.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 14.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017319057 (INGLESE JEAN-MARC [FR], et al); | [XI]WO2018225448 (TADA TOMOHIRO [JP]); | [XI]WO2019235195 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]); | US2020279368 [ ] (TADA TOMOHIRO [JP], et al); | US2021076917 [ ] (KAMON SHUMPEI [JP]) | International search | [Y]JP2018005841 (TOPCON CORP); | [Y]JP2020014711 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [XY]JP2020078539 (AI MEDICAL SERVICE INC); | by applicant | JP2009189496 |