EP4168907 - DONGLES FOR USB TYPE-C AUTHENTICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOWER, Glen Douglas Fort Collins, Colorado 80528 / US | 02 /
TABAREZ, Christopher Ritchie Fort Collins, Colorado 80528-8903 / US | 03 /
JURICH, Nicolas James Fort Collins, Colorado 80528-8903 / US | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/17] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 20945749.8 | 23.07.2020 | [2023/17] | WO2020US43268 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022019912 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4168907 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 27.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/34, G06F21/44, G06F21/62, G06F13/38 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
G06F13/385 (EP);
G06F21/44 (EP,US);
G06F13/4282 (US);
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G06F2213/0042 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | DONGLES ZUR USB-AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG VOM TYP C | [2023/17] | English: | DONGLES FOR USB TYPE-C AUTHENTICATION | [2023/17] | French: | CLÉS ÉLECTRONIQUES POUR AUTHENTIFICATION USB DE TYPE C | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 15.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010075604 (LYDON GREGORY T [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0070] ** figures 1A,1C,2A,4,5A,10 *; | [XI]US2017038810 (UEKI TAKANORI [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,8-11,14,15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0042]; figures 1,5,6,8,10 * [I] 5,7,12,13 | International search | [A]US2016127671 (HUNDAL SUKHDEEP SINGH [CA], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]US2016378704 (ADAMSON PETER S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * , paragraph [0065] *; | [A]US2018343238 (TOLA KENNETH C [US])[A] 1-15 |