EP4142188 - CLOCK SYNCHRONIZATION METHOD FOR CPRI TRANSMISSION DATA, AND RELATED APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harbin Hytera Technology Corp., Ltd. No. 188 Tianxiang Street Songbei District Harbin, Heilongjiang 150028 / CN | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Junbo Harbin, Heilongjiang 150028 / CN | 02 /
LI, Zhen Harbin, Heilongjiang 150028 / CN | 03 /
TAN, Xiao Harbin, Heilongjiang 150028 / CN | 04 /
ZHENG, Jinliang Harbin, Heilongjiang 150028 / CN | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 20946377.7 | 20.07.2020 | [2023/09] | WO2020CN102989 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022016312 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4142188 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4142188 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
H04J3/0647 (EP);
H04W88/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TAKTSYNCHRONISATIONSVERFAHREN FÜR CPRI-ÜBERTRAGUNGSDATEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/09] | English: | CLOCK SYNCHRONIZATION METHOD FOR CPRI TRANSMISSION DATA, AND RELATED APPARATUS | [2023/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNCHRONISATION D'HORLOGE POUR DONNÉES DE TRANSMISSION DE CPRI, ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2022 | Translation filed | 22.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 19.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015304971 (SHOR ROI MENAHEM [IL], et al) |