EP4181026 - RECOMMENDATION MODEL TRAINING METHOD AND APPARATUS, RECOMMENDATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Jingjie Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Hong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
DONG, Zhenhua Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Xiaolian Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
YIN, Shi Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 06 /
FENG, Xinhua Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 07 /
HE, Xiuqiang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 20946442.9 | 24.07.2020 | [2023/20] | WO2020CN104487 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022016522 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4181026 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/084, G06N3/04, G06Q30/0601 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G06N3/084 (EP);
G06Q30/0251 (US);
G06N3/04 (EP);
G06Q30/0202 (US);
G06Q30/0631 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/20] | G06N3/08, G06N3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | EMPFEHLUNGSMODELLTRAININGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, EMPFEHLUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM | [2023/20] | English: | RECOMMENDATION MODEL TRAINING METHOD AND APPARATUS, RECOMMENDATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM | [2023/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE FORMATION DE MODÈLE DE RECOMMANDATION, PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RECOMMANDATION, ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2023 | Translation filed | 10.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 12.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN109345302 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0167] *; | [I] - TOBIAS SCHNABEL ET AL, "Recommendations as Treatments: Debiasing Learning and Evaluation", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20160217), XP080684159 [I] 1-15 * Sections 1-7;; figure 1 * | [A] - MENGYE REN ET AL, "Learning to Reweight Examples for Robust Deep Learning", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20180324), XP081202774 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - Koh Pang Wei ET AL, "Understanding Black-box Predictions via Influence Functions", (20170314), pages 1 - 11, URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1703.04730v2.pdf, (20220112), XP055878299 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |