EP4181185 - POWER MODULE, AND PREPARATION MOLD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Fankun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
QIAO, Yunfei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Junhe Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 20947337.0 | 28.07.2020 | [2023/20] | WO2020CN105291 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022021094 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4181185 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/16, H01L23/31, H01L21/50, H01L21/56, H01L25/07, // H01L23/053, H01L23/24, H01L23/498 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
H01L23/3121 (EP,US);
H01L21/50 (EP);
H01L21/565 (EP,US);
H01L23/16 (EP);
H01L23/293 (US);
H01L23/49811 (EP,US);
H01L24/32 (US);
H01L24/48 (US);
H01L24/73 (US);
H01L25/072 (EP);
H01L2224/32225 (US);
H01L2224/48225 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/20] | H01L23/367, H01L23/373 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSMODUL SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSFORM UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2023/20] | English: | POWER MODULE, AND PREPARATION MOLD AND APPARATUS | [2023/20] | French: | MODULE DE PUISSANCE, ET APPAREIL ET MOULE DE PRÉPARATION | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2023 | Translation filed | 08.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 26.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013240909 (HIRAMATSU SEIKI [JP], et al); | [XYI]US2018114735 (NAKAMURA YOKO [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2020103406 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2020129195 (SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MFG [JP]) |