EP4176239 - MULTI-DEGREE OF FREEDOM FORCE AND TORQUE SENSOR AND ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Flexiv Robotics Technology Co., Ltd. Room 1096, Building C, No. 555, Dongchuan Road Minhang District Shanghai 200241 / CN | For all designated states Flexiv Ltd. Floor 4, Willow House, Cricket Square Grand Cayman, KY1-9010 / KY | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Hao Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 02 /
LI, Shuhan Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 03 /
WANG, Shiquan Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 04 /
AN, Ran Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 05 /
LI, Xuesen Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 20947454.3 | 28.07.2020 | [2023/19] | WO2020CN105012 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022021038 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4176239 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/1627, G01L5/161 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
G01L1/2231 (EP);
G01L5/0061 (US);
B25J15/0019 (US);
B25J19/02 (US);
G01L3/04 (US);
G01L5/16 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/19] | G01L5/1627 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Title | German: | KRAFT- UND DREHMOMENTSENSOR MIT MEHREREN FREIHEITSGRADEN UND ROBOTER | [2023/19] | English: | MULTI-DEGREE OF FREEDOM FORCE AND TORQUE SENSOR AND ROBOT | [2023/19] | French: | CAPTEUR DE COUPLE ET DE FORCE À DEGRÉS DE LIBERTÉ MULTIPLES ET ROBOT | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 07.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2018004121 (ROBOTOUS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,5,7-9,11,12 * paragraphs [0131] , [0132]; figure 1; claims 1,11 *[I] 3,6 |