EP4191320 - HEAD-UP DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Seungyul Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
RYU, Juhyeok Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
LIM, Jaehyuk Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Taehyeok Seoul 06772 / KR | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 20947486.5 | 31.07.2020 | [2023/23] | WO2020KR10147 | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022025329 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4191320 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G02B5/10 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
G02B27/0149 (EP);
G02B27/01 (US);
G02B5/10 (US);
G02B7/198 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0138 (US);
G02B2027/0145 (US);
G02B2027/0154 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | HEAD-UP-ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/23] | English: | HEAD-UP DISPLAY DEVICE | [2023/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE TÊTE HAUTE | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2023 | Translation filed | 27.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 10.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018292650 (SATO GENICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0025] - [0033]; figures 1-7 * [I] 1-15; | [XI]WO2019091931 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 3, paragraph first; figures 1-6; claim 1 * * page 6, paragraph last * * page 16, paragraph last - page 17, paragraph last * * pages 18-19 * [I] 1-15; | [XI]WO2019189607 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 1-15; | US2021003815 [ ] (TABATA TAICHI [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0032] - [0038]; figures 1A,1B,10 * | International search | [A]JP2017062455 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-20* See claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [Y]KR20170070306 (HYUNDAI MOBIS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0043]-[0049], claim 2 and figures 4-6. *; | [Y]JP2017116626 (JVC KENWOOD CORP) [Y] 18 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0035] and figure 3. *; | [Y]KR102016258B (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0007] and [0042]-[0088], claim 1 and figures 1-6. *; | [Y]KR20200052582 (HYUNDAI MOBIS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 16-17 * See paragraphs [0004] and [0032]-[0054] and figures 3 and 11-12. * |