EP4195034 - IN-VEHICLE INFOTAINMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR UPGRADING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 18.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jinkyoung Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Hyungbin Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
HONG, Ilgyeong Seoul 06772 / KR | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 20948579.6 | 04.08.2020 | [2023/24] | WO2020KR10256 | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022030658 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4195034 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, G06F11/14, // G06F21/31 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
G06F9/44505 (EP);
H04N21/41422 (US);
G06F11/1446 (EP);
G06F9/4451 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/24] | G06F8/654, G06F9/4401, G06F9/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGINTERNES INFOTAINMENTSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AKTUALISIERUNG DAVON | [2023/24] | English: | IN-VEHICLE INFOTAINMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR UPGRADING SAME | [2023/24] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INFODIVERTISSEMENT EMBARQUÉ DANS UN VÉHICULE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE MISE À NIVEAU | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2023 | Translation filed | 04.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 18.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002053044 (GOLD STEPHEN [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]US2010169981 (THOMAS SHAWN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-7; claims 1-11 *; | [A]US2014309862 (RICCI CHRISTOPHER P [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]KR20130075628 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2-4,10,11-20 * See paragraphs [0072]-[0073], [0075], [0083] and [0098]; claims 1 and 4; and figures 20-24, 26 and 38. *; | [Y]KR20170001488 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 5-9,15-16,19-20 * See paragraphs [0087], [0095], [0179] and [0186]; and figures 4 and 11-12. *; | [Y]KR20170025671 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0003]-[0004], [0023]-[0024], [0033], [0117] and [0120]-[0121]; claim 1; and figures 1 and 11. *; | [Y]KR20190094732 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0026] and [0035]; and figure 1. *; | [A]US2019297476 (ZHAO WENWEI [CN]) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0034]-[0044]; claims 1, 3 and 5; and figures 1C-3. * |