EP4197026 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE INCLUDING LATERAL INSULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474 Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75243 / US | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Fei Chengdu, Sichuan 611730 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Yaping Chengdu, Sichuan 610051 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Yunlong Chengdu, Sichuan 610031 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Hong Richardson, Texas 75082 / US | 05 /
YANG, Shengpin Chengdu, Sichuan 610000 / CN | 06 /
NIU, Baoqiang Chengdu, Sichuan 611731 / CN | 07 /
LIU, Rui Chengdu, Sichuan 610000 / CN | 08 /
FENG, Zhipeng Xian / CN | 09 /
SRIDHAR, Seetharaman Richardson, Texas 75082 / US | 10 /
KIM, Sunglyong Allen, Texas 75013 / US | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Zeller, Andreas Texas Instruments Deutschland GmbH EMEA Patent Department Haggertystraße 1 85356 Freising / DE | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 20949065.5 | 13.08.2020 | [2023/25] | WO2020CN108857 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022032566 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4197026 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/336, H01L29/78, H01L29/40 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
H01L29/7813 (EP,US);
H01L29/407 (EP,US);
H01L21/763 (EP);
H01L21/765 (US);
H01L21/823487 (US);
H01L29/408 (US);
H01L29/4236 (US);
H01L29/66734 (EP,US);
H01L29/7827 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/25] | H01L21/336, H01L29/78 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT MIT SEITLICHEM ISOLATOR | [2023/25] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE INCLUDING LATERAL INSULATOR | [2023/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR COMPRENANT UN ISOLATEUR LATÉRAL | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 21.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO03103056 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [Y]WO2009026174 (FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR [US], et al); | [Y]US2013256786 (HSIEH FU-YUAN [TW]); | [XYI]CN105355548 (SHANGHAI HUAHONG GRACE SEMICONDUCTOR MFG CORP) |