EP4196393 - FLIGHT CONTROL SYSTEM FOR AN AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enexsys Research Inc. 208 - 32910 Amicus Place Abbotsford, British Columbia V2S 6G9 / CA | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENKE, James Abbotsford, British Columbia V2S 6G9 / CA | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 20949679.3 | 17.08.2020 | [2023/25] | WO2020CA51125 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022036433 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4196393 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 24.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B64C9/00, B64C13/28, B64C9/02, B64C9/04, // B64C27/82 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
B64C13/28 (EP);
B64C3/546 (US);
B64C1/26 (US);
B64C27/06 (US);
B64C3/185 (US);
B64C9/02 (EP);
B64C9/04 (EP,US);
B64C9/06 (US);
B64C9/18 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/25] | B64C9/00, B64C13/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | FLUGSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN FLUGZEUG | [2023/25] | English: | FLIGHT CONTROL SYSTEM FOR AN AIRCRAFT | [2023/25] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE VOL POUR UN AÉRONEF | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 10.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US3321157 (TURNER THOMAS R); | [YA]US4462559 (GARZA ROBERTO M [US]); | [X]US2011036939 (EASTER WILLIAM CRAIG [US]); | [XYI]US2020055585 (HUNG LUCAS KAI-LUEN [US]) | International search | [XY]US2279615 (ETTORE BUGATTI); | [Y]US2010140393 (BENDER KLAUS [DE]); | [XY]US2011135472 (CAZALS OLIVIER [FR], et al); | [Y]US2013087653 (BRAND ALBERT G [US], et al); | [Y]CN107738745 (BAOJI OUYA CHEMICAL EQUIPMENT MFT) |