EP4201839 - WRAPPING MATERIAL FOR COMMERCIAL TOBACCO PRODUCTS AND PACKAGE FOR COMMERCIAL TOBACCO PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6927 / JP | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONUMA, Yuta Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 02 /
ONO, Hiroyoshi Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 03 /
IWATA, Shinichi Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 20950284.8 | 19.08.2020 | [2023/26] | WO2020JP31301 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022038719 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4201839 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/12, B32B1/00, B32B3/04, B32B15/20, B32B29/00, B65D85/10 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
B65D75/5838 (EP);
B65D85/1018 (EP,KR);
B65D85/1036 (EP,US);
B32B1/00 (EP);
B32B15/12 (EP,KR);
B32B15/20 (EP,KR);
B32B29/002 (EP);
B32B29/06 (EP);
B32B3/02 (EP);
B32B3/04 (EP);
B32B3/30 (EP);
B32B37/1207 (KR);
B32B37/1292 (KR);
B32B7/12 (EP);
B65D75/12 (EP,KR);
B65D75/20 (EP);
B65D75/5833 (EP);
B65D77/003 (US);
B65D85/10 (EP);
B65D85/1027 (EP);
B32B2037/1215 (KR);
B32B2250/02 (EP);
B32B2255/06 (EP);
B32B2255/12 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2307/31 (EP);
B32B2307/7246 (EP);
B32B2307/7265 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2307/7376 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/26] | B65D85/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL FÜR KOMMERZIELLE TABAKPRODUKTE UND VERPACKUNG FÜR KOMMERZIELLE TABAKPRODUKTE | [2023/26] | English: | WRAPPING MATERIAL FOR COMMERCIAL TOBACCO PRODUCTS AND PACKAGE FOR COMMERCIAL TOBACCO PRODUCTS | [2023/26] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'EMBALLAGE POUR PRODUITS DE TABAC COMMERCIAUX ET EMBALLAGE POUR PRODUITS DE TABAC COMMERCIAUX | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2022 | Translation filed | 01.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 09.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3301468 (JOHN STALEY) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * claim 1 * * column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 39 * * figures 2, 4 * [I] 4,7,11,12; | [A]US3333683 (SCHARRE EDWARD W) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 * * column 2, line 14 - line 35 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4807745 (LANGLEY WILLIAM H [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 13 - line 38 * * examples 1, 2 *; | [A]US5427235 (POWELL MARK S [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1, 2 *; | [A]US2012111746 (TANBO HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 * * figure 4 *; | [A]JP2016159932 (KYORAKU CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 ** figure 2 *; | [X]WO2019025962 (CREATIVE PLASTICS [IN]) [X] 1,8 * claims 1, 2, 5, 16 * * example 4 * * page 3, line 21 - line 22 * * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 11 * * page 8, line 10 - line 11 * * table 3 * | International search | [Y]JP2568116B (R J REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO) [Y] 1-12 * , column 4, line 48 to column 5, line 8, column 7, line 12 to line 14, fig. 1, 1a *; | [Y]JP2000509681 (ROTHMANS INTERNATIONAL SERVICES LTD.) [Y] 4, 7 * , p. 7, line 10 to line 11, fig. 1 *; | [Y]JP2003181983 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 10-11 * , paragraph [0010] *; | [A]JP2009292517 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC, et al)[A] 1-12; | [Y]WO2011007422 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al) [Y] 2-4, 9-11 * , paragraphs [0029], [0030], [0037], fig. 4, 7 *; | [Y]JP2016159932 (KYORAKU CO LTD) [Y] 11 * , paragraphs [0025], [0036], fig. 4, 6 *; | [A]JP2017185657 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-12; | [Y]JP2018167881 (MINAMIZAWA HIROYUKI) [Y] 1-12 * , paragraphs [0002], [0011], [0015], [0017], fig. 1-3 * | by applicant | WO2018092179 |