Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
03.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
03.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
27.10.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
27.10.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
01.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.06.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
02.06.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
08.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.04.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.03.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
24.03.2023 | Change - representative | |
24.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.03.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |