EP4214937 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR PERFORMING SERVICE SUBSCRIPTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARCIA MARTIN, Miguel Angel 28224 Pozuelo De Alarcon ( Madrid) / ES | 02 /
ACEVEDO MONTSERRAT, Pablo 28420 Galapagar / ES | 03 /
CASTELLANOS ZAMORA, David 28026 Madrid / ES | 04 /
LU, Yunjie Shanghai 200335 / CN | 05 /
MERINO VAZQUEZ, Emiliano 28916 Leganés, Madrid / ES | 06 /
GAN, Juying Shanghai 200335 / CN | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/30] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | Application number, filing date | 20953789.3 | 21.09.2020 | [2023/30] | WO2020CN116605 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022056931 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4214937 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/18 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
H04W8/00 (EP);
H04W8/18 (EP,US);
H04W48/18 (US);
H04W88/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/30] | H04W4/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON DIENSTABONNEMENTS | [2023/30] | English: | METHODS AND DEVICES FOR PERFORMING SERVICE SUBSCRIPTIONS | [2023/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS POUR EFFECTUER DES ABONNEMENTS À UN SERVICE | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 23.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3592012 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); |