EP4218292 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES OF A MOBILITY ROBUSTNESS OPTIMIZATION MECHANISM FOR A CONDITIONAL HANDOVER PROCEDURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenovo (Beijing) Limited 6 Shangdi West Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Lianhai Beijing 100028 / CN | 02 /
DAI, Mingzeng Shanghai / CN | 03 /
WANG, Haiming Beijing 100011 / CN | 04 /
YUE, Ran Beijing 100083 / CN | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 20954602.7 | 25.09.2020 | [2023/31] | WO2020CN117865 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022061750 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4218292 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
H04W36/0079 (EP);
H04W36/00833 (EP);
H04W36/08 (US);
H04W36/249 (US);
H04W36/00835 (US);
H04W36/362 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN EINES MECHANISMUS ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER MOBILITÄTSROBUSTHEIT FÜR EIN BEDINGTES HANDOVER-VERFAHREN | [2023/31] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUSES OF A MOBILITY ROBUSTNESS OPTIMIZATION MECHANISM FOR A CONDITIONAL HANDOVER PROCEDURE | [2023/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS LIÉS À UN MÉCANISME D'OPTIMISATION DE ROBUSTESSE DE MOBILITÉ POUR UNE PROCÉDURE DE TRANSFERT INTERCELLULAIRE CONDITIONNEL | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2020164365 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | EP3917213 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); |