EP4047708 - ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY, BATTERY CELL, BATTERY, AND ELECTRICAL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology (Hong Kong) Limited Level 19, China Building 29 Queen's Road Central Central, Central And Western District / HK | [2024/40] |
Former [2022/34] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2, Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde Fujian 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Haizu Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Xiaona Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Xiaomei Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Jiang Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 05 /
CHEN, Wenwei Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20955063.1 | 24.12.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020CN139149 | Priority number, date | CN20202287154U | 22.09.2020 Original published format: CN 202022087154 U | [2022/34] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022062221 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4047708 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/13 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
H01M10/058 (EP);
H01M10/0583 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/04 (EP);
H01M10/0431 (EP);
H01M10/0436 (EP);
H01M10/045 (EP);
H01M10/0459 (EP);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0585 (EP);
H01M4/02 (EP);
H01M4/04 (EP);
H01M4/13 (EP);
H01M4/70 (EP);
H01M50/531 (EP);
H01M50/533 (EP);
H01M2004/025 (EP);
H01M2220/20 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2220/30 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | H01M10/0583 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENANORDNUNG, BATTERIEZELLE, BATTERIE UND ELEKTRISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/34] | English: | ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY, BATTERY CELL, BATTERY, AND ELECTRICAL APPARATUS | [2022/34] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ÉLECTRODES, ÉLÉMENT DE BATTERIE, BATTERIE ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2022 | Translation filed | 05.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 14.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP3397351B ; | [Y]US2010119940 (OKANO SATOSHI [JP], et al); | [X]CN101740799 (SHARP KK); | [Y]US2011104567 (LEE HYOUNG-NO [KR]); | [Y]US2012237819 (AHN CHANG-BUM [KR]) |