EP4223397 - SYSTEM FOR WASHING BIOLOGICAL WASTE TO RECOVER SAME AS SOLID BIOFUEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIGNIUM IP LLC 4200 San Jacinto St. Houston, TX 77004 / US | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARABALL UGARTE, José Antonio Valparaíso / CL | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Sugrañes, S.L.P. Calle Provenza 304 08008 Barcelona / ES | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 20955481.5 | 02.10.2020 | [2023/32] | WO2020CL50112 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022067450 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | ES | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4223397 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CL | 07.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/30, C10L5/44 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
C05F3/06 (EP);
C10L5/42 (EP,US);
B09B3/30 (EP);
B09B3/32 (EP);
C02F9/00 (EP);
C05F3/00 (EP);
C10L5/08 (US);
C10L5/361 (US);
C10L5/363 (US);
C10L5/44 (EP);
C02F1/004 (EP);
C02F1/38 (EP);
C02F1/48 (EP);
C02F1/78 (EP);
C02F2303/10 (EP);
C02F2303/26 (EP);
C05G5/10 (EP);
C10L2200/0469 (US);
C10L2290/06 (US);
C10L2290/08 (EP,US);
C10L2290/14 (EP);
C10L2290/24 (EP);
C10L2290/28 (EP);
C10L2290/30 (EP);
C10L2290/34 (EP);
C10L2290/46 (EP);
C10L2290/50 (EP);
C10L2290/545 (EP,US);
C10L2290/546 (EP);
C10L2290/547 (US);
Y02A40/20 (EP);
Y02E50/10 (EP);
Y02E50/30 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/32] | B01F/ | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM WASCHEN VON BIOLOGISCHEN ABFÄLLEN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG DAVON ALS FESTER BIOKRAFTSTOFF | [2023/32] | English: | SYSTEM FOR WASHING BIOLOGICAL WASTE TO RECOVER SAME AS SOLID BIOFUEL | [2023/32] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LAVAGE DE RÉSIDUS BIOLOGIQUES POUR LEUR RÉCUPÉRATION COMME BIOCOMBUSTIBLE SOLIDE | [2023/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2023 | Translation filed | 28.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CL | 28.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 03.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2017181299 (CARABALL UGARTE JOSÉ [CL]); | [AD]US2019106643 (UGARTE JOSE CARABALL [CL]); | International search | [A]JP2004105878 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK, et al); | [A]US2010107474 (TALWAR MAHESH [US], et al); | [A]US8043496 (SCHUH PETER ALLEN [US], et al); | [A]KR101164507B (SHIN YOUNG E & I CO LTD [KR]); | [A]WO2012170519 (AMIRAN MOHSEN C [US]); | [A]EP3219680 (INVERSIONES DE LAS CINCO VILLAS 2008 S L [ES]); | [Y]WO2017181299 (CARABALL UGARTE JOSÉ [CL]); | [A]EP3279309 (THREE ES S R L [IT]); | by applicant | US4018899 | US6149694 | ES2171111 | WO2009108761 | US2010304440 | CA2670530 | US2011089271 | WO2011133190 | DE102010019321 | WO2013007847 | US2014250776 | US2015004654 | CN104611084 | WO2015086869 | DE102014116250 | WO2017000009 |