EP4158824 - ACQUISITION OF QUASI-CO-LOCATION INFORMATION USING TRANSMISSION CONFIGURATION INDICATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEI, Meng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Chuangxin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LU, Zhaohua Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
GAO, Bo Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Shujuan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 20955691.9 | 30.09.2020 | [2023/14] | WO2020CN119407 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022067666 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4158824 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H04L5/0051 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0016 (KR);
H04L5/0032 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | ERFASSUNG VON QUASI-CO-STANDORTINFORMATIONEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ÜBERTRAGUNGSKONFIGURATIONSINDIKATOREN | [2023/14] | English: | ACQUISITION OF QUASI-CO-LOCATION INFORMATION USING TRANSMISSION CONFIGURATION INDICATORS | [2023/14] | French: | ACQUISITION D'INFORMATIONS DE QUASI COLOCALISATION À L'AIDE D'INDICATEURS DE CONFIGURATION DE TRANSMISSION | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 17.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2019195171 (FUTUREWEI TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); |