EP4224757 - FREQUENCY DOMAIN POSITION DETERMINATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUO, Zhisong Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
XU, Weijie Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 20955759.4 | 30.09.2020 | [2023/32] | WO2020CN119591 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022067735 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4224757 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L5/00, H04L1/08, H04B1/00 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
H04L1/08 (EP,US);
H04L5/0012 (EP,US);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04L5/0007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/32] | H04L1/18, H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER FREQUENZDOMÄNENPOSITION, VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/32] | English: | FREQUENCY DOMAIN POSITION DETERMINATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTERMINATION DE POSITION DE DOMAINE FRÉQUENTIEL, DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2023/32] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2023 | Translation filed | 22.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 05.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2019136778 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]) [A] 7 * abstract *; | [XI]WO2020145368 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12,15 * paragraphs [0161] , [0201] , [0202]; figure 9 * [I] 5-7,13,14; | US2020351893 [ ] (LIN YANAN [CN]) [ ] * paragraphs [0088] , [0090] , [0091] *; | [XI] - MEDIATEK INC, "Enhancements of NR PUSCH for URLLC", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20181112 - 20181116, (20181111), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1812376 ENHANCEMENTS OF NR PUSCH FOR URLLC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/R1%2D1812376%2Ezip, (20181111), XP051554285 [X] 1-4,8-12,15 * sections 4 and 5;; figure 5 * [I] 5-7,13,14 |