blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4216553

EP4216553 - POINT CLOUD DECODING AND ENCODING METHOD, AND DECODER, ENCODER AND ENCODING AND DECODING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2023
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.04.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD.
No. 18 Haibin Road
Wusha, Chang'an
Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN
[2023/30]
Inventor(s)01 / YUAN, Hui
Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN
02 / LI, Ming
Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN
03 / LIU, Qi
Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN
04 / WANG, Lu
Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN
05 / WANG, Xiaohui
Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN
 [2023/30]
Representative(s)Taor, Simon Edward William, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2023/30]
Application number, filing date20955799.030.09.2020
[2023/30]
WO2020CN119687
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022067776
Date:07.04.2022
Language:ZH
[2022/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4216553
Date:26.07.2023
Language:EN
[2023/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.04.2022
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.2023
ClassificationIPC:H04N19/597, G06T9/00, H04N19/117
[2023/47]
CPC:
H04N19/80 (EP); G06T9/001 (EP,US); G06T9/004 (EP);
H04N19/117 (EP); H04N19/597 (EP)
Former IPC [2023/30]H04N19/593, H04N19/13
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/30]
TitleGerman:PUNKTWOLKENDECODIERUNGS- UND -CODIERUNGSVERFAHREN SOWIE DECODIERER, CODIERER UND CODIERUNGS- UND DECODIERUNGSSYSTEM[2023/30]
English:POINT CLOUD DECODING AND ENCODING METHOD, AND DECODER, ENCODER AND ENCODING AND DECODING SYSTEM[2023/30]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE ET DE DÉCODAGE DE NUAGE DE POINTS, DÉCODEUR, CODEUR ET SYSTÈME DE CODAGE ET DE DÉCODAGE[2023/30]
Entry into regional phase19.04.2023Translation filed 
19.04.2023National basic fee paid 
19.04.2023Search fee paid 
19.04.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.2023Examination requested  [2023/30]
07.05.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
15.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US2017347100  (CHOU PHILIP A [US], et al) [I] 1,6,10 * [0046], [0059], [0064], [0081], [0084] * * figures 3b, 4b *;
 [A]  - HARGRAVE P J, "A tutorial introduction to Kalman filtering", 19890101, (19890101), pages 1/1 - 1/6, XP006525927 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BIRENDRA KATHARIYA (HUAWEI) ET AL, "[PCC] [new proposal] Binary-tree based level-of-details generation for attributes coding in G-PCC", no. m44940, (20181010), 124. MPEG MEETING; 20181008 - 20181012; MACAO; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/124_Macao/wg11/m44940-v2-m44940_v1.zip m44940_v1.docx, (20181010), XP030193255 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * sections 1, and 2.1;; figures 2.1, 2.2 *
 [A]  - "PCC WD G-PCC (Geometry-based PCC)", no. n17770, (20181006), 123. MPEG MEETING; 20180716 - 20180720; LJUBLJANA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/123_Ljubljana/wg11/w17770.zip w17770_WDv3_GPCC_clean.docx, (20181006), XP030192941 [A] 1-12 * section 3.29 on page 8 * * section 9.3.2 on pages 40-41 *
 [A]  - SEHOON YEA ET AL, "[G-PCC] Bilateral Filtering for Predictive Transform in G-PCC", no. m46365, (20190112), 125. MPEG MEETING; 20190114 - 20190118; MARRAKECH; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/125_Marrakech/wg11/m46365-v1-m46365.zip m46365.docx, (20190112), XP030215006 [A] 1-12 * sections 1 and 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.