EP4041675 - HYDROGEN TRANSPORT, DISTRIBUTION AND STORAGE SYSTEM, METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H2 Clipper, Inc. 1110 Anacapa Street 200 Santa Barbara CA 93101 / US | [2023/21] |
Former [2022/37] | For all designated states H2 Clipper, Inc. 2020 APS, Suite 135 Santa Barbara, CA 93103 / US | ||
Former [2022/33] | For all designated states H2 Clipper, Inc. 2020 APS, Suite 135 Santa Barbara, CA 93103 / US | ||
For all designated states Ewan, James M. c/o H2 Clipper, Inc. 2020 APS, Suite 135 Santa Barbara, CA 93103 / US | |||
For all designated states Shelton, Robert H. c/o H2 Clipper, Inc. 2020 APS, Suite 135 Santa Barbara, California 93103 / US | |||
For all designated states Brutoco, Rinaldo S. c/o H2 Clipper, Inc. 2020 APS, Suite 135 Santa Barbara, CA 93103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EWAN, James M. Santa Barbara, California 93101 / US | 02 /
SHELTON, Robert H. Santa Barbara, California 93101 / US | 03 /
BRUTOCO, Rinaldo S. Santa Barbara, California 93101 / US | [2023/20] |
Former [2022/33] | 01 /
EWAN, James M. Santa Barbara, California 93103 / US | ||
02 /
SHELTON, Robert H. Santa Barbara, California 93103 / US | |||
03 /
BRUTOCO, Rinaldo S. Santa Barbara, California 93103 / US | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20960190.5 | 10.11.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020US59786 | Priority number, date | US202063106148P | 27.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063106148 P | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022093289 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4041675 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B67D9/02, F17C13/02, F17C7/02, F17D1/02, F17D5/02 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
F17D1/04 (EP,KR,US);
F17C11/005 (KR,US);
B64B1/66 (EP,KR);
B64F1/029 (EP,KR);
C25B1/04 (KR,US);
C25B9/65 (KR,US);
F16L9/12 (KR,US);
F16L9/19 (EP,KR);
F17C5/06 (KR,US);
F17D1/02 (EP);
F17D3/01 (EP,KR,US);
F17D3/08 (EP);
F17D3/18 (EP,KR,US);
F17D5/02 (EP);
F17D5/06 (US);
B64B1/00 (US);
F17C2221/012 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2221/033 (KR,US);
F17C2223/0123 (KR,US);
F17C2223/0161 (KR,US);
F17C2270/0184 (KR,US);
Y02A30/60 (EP);
Y02E60/32 (EP);
Y02E60/34 (EP,KR);
Y02P90/45 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | B67D9/02, F17C13/02, F17C7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | WASSERSTOFFTRANSPORT-, VERTEILUNGS- UND SPEICHERSYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2022/33] | English: | HYDROGEN TRANSPORT, DISTRIBUTION AND STORAGE SYSTEM, METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2022/33] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSPORT, DE DISTRIBUTION ET DE STOCKAGE D'HYDROGÈNE | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 10.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]RU2140605 (TSYPLAKOV OLEG GEORGIEVICH, et al); | [XYI]US2004084083 (PEARSON MARTIN [CA]); | [XYI]JP2006138351 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JP4584675B ; | [XYI]EP2569571 (LINDE AG [DE]); | [A]US2019330033 (BRUTOCO RINALDO [US]) | International search | [A]US4272042 (SLATER SAUL I) [A] 1-47 * Entire document *; | [Y]US6108967 (ERICKSON STEWART E [US]) [Y] 19, 41 * Entire document, especially, Abstract, col 10 In 41-67; col 11 In 1-3 *; | [YA]US6896222 (DOSSAS VASILIOS [US], et al) [Y] 22,24 * Entire documentm especially, Abstract, col 2 In 13-18; col 4 In 21-22, 40-43 * [A] 23, 27-28; | [XYA]US2008121643 (BLENCOE JAMES G [US], et al) [X] 39, 45 * Entire document, especially Abstract, para [0007]; [0012]; [0018]; [0037]-[0038]; [0042]-[0043] * [Y] 7, 13, 15-17, 25, 40, 46-47 [A] 40-44; | [XYA]US2009313896 (GLIDEWELL CAMERON [US]) [X] 1-2, 14, 20-21, 26 * Entire document, especially Abstract, para 0008]; [0023]; [0025]-[0026]; [0033]; [0036]; [0040]; [0045]; [0051]; [0059]-[0061]; Fig. 2 * [Y] 7, 13, 15-17, 19, 29-30, 32-33, 35-38, 46 [A] 3-6, 8-12, 18, 23, 27-28, 31,34; | [YA]US2010059528 (ZHEVAGO NIKOLAY [RU], et al) [Y] 29-30, 32-33, 35-38 * Entire document, especially Abstract, para [0019]; [0050]; [0083]-[0084]; [0092] * [A] 34; | [A]US8932184 (REDMOND SCOTT D [US]) [A] 1-47* Entire document *; | [A]US9278807 (DRNEVICH RAYMOND FRANCIS [US]) [A] 1-47 * Entire document *; | [A]US9316228 (BECKER FREDERICK E [US], et al) [A] 1-47 * Entire document * | by applicant | RU2140605 | US2004084083 | JP2006138351 | JP4584675B | US8336810 | EP2569571 | US2019330033 | US20080290453 |