EP4245079 - ACCESS POINT, STATION, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Lei Singapore 049483 / SG | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 20961137.5 | 13.11.2020 | [2023/38] | WO2020CN128543 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022099580 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4245079 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W74/08, H04W84/12, H04W74/00, // H04W74/0833 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
H04W74/006 (EP);
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04W72/04 (US);
H04W84/12 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | H04W72/04, H04W74/08, H04W84/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | ZUGANGSPUNKT, STATION UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2023/38] | English: | ACCESS POINT, STATION, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2023/38] | French: | POINT D'ACCÈS, STATION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2020112021 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]); |