EP4235384 - INPUT DISPLAY CONTROL DEVICE, INPUT DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD, AND INPUT DISPLAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAI, Masato Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
MATSUBARA, Tsutomu Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
YAMAUCHI, Takashi Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 20962444.4 | 19.11.2020 | [2023/35] | WO2020JP43229 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022107281 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4235384 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G06F3/14, G06F3/0481, G06F3/04845, G06F3/04883, G06F3/0487, G09G5/08, G09G5/26, G09G5/38, G10L15/26, G06T11/20 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
G06T11/203 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (KR);
G06F3/1462 (US);
G06F3/0481 (EP);
G06F3/04845 (EP,US);
G06F3/0487 (EP);
G06F3/04883 (EP);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G06F3/1454 (EP);
G06T3/40 (US);
G09G2340/0442 (EP);
G09G2340/0464 (EP);
G09G5/08 (EP);
G09G5/26 (EP);
G09G5/38 (EP);
G10L15/26 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | G06F3/0488, G06F3/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | EINGABEANZEIGESTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, EINGABEANZEIGESTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND EINGABEANZEIGESYSTEM | [2023/35] | English: | INPUT DISPLAY CONTROL DEVICE, INPUT DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD, AND INPUT DISPLAY SYSTEM | [2023/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE D'ENTRÉE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE D'ENTRÉE ET SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE D'ENTRÉE | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2023 | Translation filed | 10.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 29.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2015064841 (OPTIM CORP); | [Y]JP6641530B ; | US2021248407 [ ] (HIRAI MASATO [JP]) | International search | [Y]JP2008210143 (SONY CORP) [Y] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0033], [0051]-[0076], fig. 2-7 *; | [A]JP2012073984 (TOSHIBA TEC KK) [A] 1-8* , paragraphs [0004], [0033] *; | [Y]JP6641530B (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) [Y] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0010]-[0055], [0062], [0069]-[0074], [0078]-[0085], [0094]-[0109], fig. 1, 16, 20-22, 26, 27, 29-32 * | by applicant | JPH0341530B |