blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4238829

EP4238829 - DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.08.2023
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.06.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shenzhen Yinwang Intelligent Technologies Co., Ltd.
Room 101, Huawei Headquarters Office Building
Huawei, Vanke City Community
Bantian Street
Longgang District
Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2024/51]
Former [2023/36]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / HE, Jin
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2023/36]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2023/36]Huawei European IPR
Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH
Riesstraße 25
80992 München / DE
Application number, filing date20962666.224.11.2020
[2023/36]
WO2020CN131097
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022109775
Date:02.06.2022
Language:ZH
[2022/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4238829
Date:06.09.2023
Language:EN
[2023/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN02.06.2022
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2023
ClassificationIPC:B60R11/02, G09G3/00, B60Q3/60, B60Q3/80, H04N9/31, B60Q3/70
[2023/50]
CPC:
G09G3/002 (EP,US); B60R11/02 (CN); B60K35/22 (EP);
B60K35/25 (EP); B60K35/60 (EP); B60K35/81 (EP);
B60Q3/60 (US); B60Q3/74 (EP,US); B60Q3/80 (US);
H04N9/3147 (EP); B60K2360/162 (EP); B60K2360/334 (EP);
B60K2360/563 (EP); B60Q3/233 (EP); B60Q3/85 (EP);
B60R2011/0003 (CN); G09G2354/00 (EP,US); G09G2370/16 (EP,US);
G09G2380/10 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2023/36]B60R11/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/36]
TitleGerman:ANZEIGESTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG[2023/36]
English:DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE[2023/36]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL[2023/36]
Entry into regional phase02.06.2023Translation filed 
02.06.2023National basic fee paid 
02.06.2023Search fee paid 
02.06.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.2023Examination requested  [2023/36]
29.05.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.05.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
02.12.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2016355133  (KIM MINGOO [KR], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.