EP4236379 - SECURITY AUTHENTICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS APPLIED TO WIFI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Kai Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
GU, Yanjie Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 20962832.0 | 26.11.2020 | [2023/35] | WO2020CN131855 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022109941 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4236379 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, H04W4/00, H04W84/12, H04L9/00, H04W12/0433, H04W12/06 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H04W12/0433 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04L63/083 (EP);
H04L9/0833 (EP);
H04L9/0863 (EP);
H04L9/3066 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/35] | H04W4/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSAUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR WIFI | [2023/35] | English: | SECURITY AUTHENTICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS APPLIED TO WIFI | [2023/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AUTHENTIFICATION DE SÉCURITÉ APPLIQUÉS AU WI-FI | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2023 | Translation filed | 26.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 22.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN105898743 (LEKA AUTOMOBILE INTELLIGENT TECH (BEIJING) CO LTD) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0026] *; | [A]CN110087240 (INST COMPUTING TECH CAS) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0023] *; | [A] - LOUNIS KARIM ET AL, WPA3 Connection Deprivation Attacks, TOPICS IN CRYPTOLOGY - CT-RSA 2020 : THE CRYPTOGRAPHERS' TRACK AT THE RSA CONFERENCE 2020, SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA, FEBRUARY 24-28, 2020, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, PAGE(S) 164 - 176, (20200228), XP047545161 [A] 1-15 * section 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-030-41568-6_11 |