blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4243481

EP4243481 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.03.2025
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.08.2023
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.06.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2025First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2023/37]
Inventor(s)01 / XIN, Yang
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / CHONG, Weiwei
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / WU, Xiaobo
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2023/37]
Representative(s)Maiwald GmbH
Engineering
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
[2023/37]
Application number, filing date20963909.502.12.2020
[2023/37]
WO2020CN133449
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022116061
Date:09.06.2022
Language:ZH
[2022/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4243481
Date:13.09.2023
Language:EN
[2023/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN09.06.2022
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2023
ClassificationIPC:H04W24/08, H04W24/02, H04L43/00
[2023/52]
CPC:
H04W24/08 (EP); H04W28/0215 (US); H04L41/14 (EP);
H04L41/5009 (EP); H04L43/55 (US); H04L41/16 (EP);
H04W24/02 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2023/37]H04W24/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/37]
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG[2023/37]
English:COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS[2023/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION[2023/37]
Entry into regional phase05.06.2023Translation filed 
05.06.2023National basic fee paid 
05.06.2023Search fee paid 
05.06.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2023Examination requested  [2023/37]
12.06.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.03.2025Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2025Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.