EP4255652 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR FORMING SHAPE OF METAL FOIL PRODUCTS WITH WRINKLELESS SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Hong Kong Polytechnic University Hunghom Kowloon / HK | For all designated states Beta Pack International Limited Unit 7, 23/F, Wing Fung Ind. Bldg. 40-50 Sha Tsui Rd., Tsuen Wan N.T., Hong Kong / HK | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAN, Luen Chow Hong Kong / HK | 02 /
ZHENG, Pengfei Hong Kong / HK | 03 /
KONG, Ting Fai Hong Kong / HK | 04 /
TONG, Shui Yuk Hong Kong / HK | 05 /
LUI, Tin Loi Hong Kong / HK | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Fabry, Bernd IP2 Patentanwalts GmbH Schlossstrasse 523-525 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 20963972.3 | 04.12.2020 | [2023/41] | WO2020CN133770 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022116126 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4255652 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B21D26/021, B21D33/00, B21D22/20 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
B21D33/00 (EP);
B21D22/205 (EP);
B21D26/025 (EP);
B21D26/027 (EP);
B21D26/029 (EP);
B21D26/053 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/41] | B21D26/021, B21D33/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METALLFOLIEN MIT FALTENFREIER OBERFLÄCHE | [2023/41] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR FORMING SHAPE OF METAL FOIL PRODUCTS WITH WRINKLELESS SURFACE | [2023/41] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UNE FORME DE PRODUITS EN FEUILLE MÉTALLIQUE PRÉSENTANT UNE SURFACE SANS PLIS | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 01.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS554818U ; | [X]GB2131334 (METAL BOX PLC); | [X]CN102896195 (HUANG QIRUI); | [X]CN107745029 (SHANGHAI AEROSPACE EQUIPMENT MFG GENERAL FACTORY) |