EP4258240 - REDUNDANT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku / Yokohama-Shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYAKAWA, Yasuhisa Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 02 /
TAKEDA, Fuminori Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 03 /
AJIRO, Keigo Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 20964311.3 | 04.12.2020 | [2023/41] | WO2020JP45205 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022118459 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4258240 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60W50/023, B60W30/12, B60W10/20, B60W10/26, G08G1/16 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
B60W50/023 (EP);
B60W60/007 (US);
B60W10/20 (EP);
B60W10/26 (EP);
B60W30/12 (EP);
B60W30/16 (EP);
B60W50/0205 (EP);
B60W50/029 (EP);
B60W60/0015 (EP);
B60W60/00186 (EP);
B60W2050/0006 (EP);
B60W2050/021 (EP);
B60W2050/0292 (EP);
B60W2554/802 (EP);
B60W2555/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/41] | G08G1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | REDUNDANTES SYSTEM | [2023/41] | English: | REDUNDANT SYSTEM | [2023/41] | French: | SYSTÈME REDONDANT | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2023 | Translation filed | 25.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2018220811 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2019092150 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME FUER NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH [DE]); | [Y]GB2576206 (JAGUAR LAND ROVER LTD [GB]); | [XI]DE102018220605 (AUDI AG [DE]); | US2021163026 [ ] (OCHIDA JUN [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JP2019089382 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-10 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2019126208 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-10* , entire text, all drawings *; | [XA]JP2020097352 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [X] 1, 9 * , paragraphs [0038], [0039], [0071]-[0078], fig. 4, paragraphs [0038], [0039], [0071]-[0078], fig. 4 * [A] 2-8, 10 | by applicant | JP2018504309 |