EP4261101 - BOGIE AND RAIL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRRC TANGSHAN CO., LTD. No. 3 Changqian Road Fengrun District Tangshan Hebei 063035 / CN | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xiaojun Tangshan, Hebei 063035 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Yanhong Tangshan, Hebei 063035 / CN | 03 /
QIN, Chengwei Tangshan, Hebei 063035 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Junfeng Tangshan, Hebei 063035 / CN | 05 /
CHU, Bogang Tangshan, Hebei 063035 / CN | 06 /
ZHANG, Wenzhao Tangshan, Hebei 063035 / CN | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 20964918.5 | 25.12.2020 | [2023/42] | WO2020CN139404 | Priority number, date | CN202011429611 | 09.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011429611 | [2023/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022120989 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4261101 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B61F5/52, B61F5/30 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
B61F5/52 (EP,CN);
B61F15/20 (EP);
B61F5/10 (EP,CN);
B61F5/12 (EP);
B61F5/22 (EP);
B61F5/30 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | DREHGESTELL UND SCHIENENFAHRZEUG | [2023/42] | English: | BOGIE AND RAIL VEHICLE | [2023/42] | French: | BOGIE ET VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2023 | Translation filed | 22.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0965512 (ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA [FR]); | [A]EP0983922 (ALSTOM FRANCE SA [FR]); | [A]US9376127 (NISHIMURA TAKEHIRO [JP], et al) |