EP4261554 - METHOD FOR DETECTING INTERNAL SHORT CIRCUIT OF BATTERY, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dongguan NVT Technology Limited No.8 Xingguo Middle Road Jiaoshe Village Dongkeng Town Donguan, Guangdong 523000 / CN | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Boyang Dongguan, Guangdong 523000 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Zhifeng Dongguan, Guangdong 523000 / CN | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 20965408.6 | 15.12.2020 | [2023/42] | WO2020CN136585 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022126390 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4261554 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/52, G01R31/389 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
G01R31/52 (EP,CN,US);
G01R31/385 (CN,US);
G01R31/389 (EP);
H01M10/48 (EP,US);
G01R31/392 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG EINES INTERNEN KURZSCHLUSSES EINER BATTERIE, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/42] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING INTERNAL SHORT CIRCUIT OF BATTERY, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE COURT-CIRCUIT INTERNE D'UNE BATTERIE, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2023 | Translation filed | 13.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 12.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN107192914 (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD, et al); | [A]EP3599694 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [A]CN111198327 (BEIJING INSTITUTE TECH); | [A]CN111208439 (UNIV SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CHINA) |