EP4273989 - SULFATE COMPOUND, NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE CONTAINING SAME, AND POWER STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AESC Japan Ltd. 10-1 Hironodai 2-chome Zama-Shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Renhe Shanghai 201315 / CN | 02 /
YU, Le Shanghai 201315 / CN | 03 /
ZHAO, Weijun Shanghai 201315 / CN | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 20967360.7 | 29.12.2020 | [2023/45] | WO2020CN140548 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022141010 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4273989 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D327/10, C07D497/10, H01M10/0567, H01M10/0525 | [2024/42] | CPC: |
H01M10/0567 (EP,US);
C07D327/10 (EP);
C07D497/10 (EP);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0568 (EP);
H01M10/0569 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M2300/0025 (EP);
H01M2300/004 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/45] | H01M10/0567, H01M10/0525 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | SULFATVERBINDUNG, NICHTWÄSSRIGES ELEKTROLYT DAMIT UND ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2023/45] | English: | SULFATE COMPOUND, NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE CONTAINING SAME, AND POWER STORAGE DEVICE | [2023/45] | French: | COMPOSÉ SULFATE, ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX LE CONTENANT ET DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2022 | Translation filed | 21.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 13.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |