Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3971750 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3971750



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 273
24.03.2025 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
28.05.2024 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
18.04.2024 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.04.2024 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
09.04.2024 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
05.04.2024 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
05.04.2024 Annex Search / examination 3
05.04.2024 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.04.2024 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
28.03.2024 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
28.03.2024 Notification of termination of representative's authorisation Search / examination 2
19.03.2024 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 4
06.02.2024 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
10.01.2024 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Search / examination 1
10.01.2024 Notification of termination of representative's authorisation Search / examination 1
05.01.2024 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
02.01.2024 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
02.01.2024 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.01.2024 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.01.2024 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.01.2024 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 28
02.01.2024 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 29
23.11.2023 Examination started Search / examination 1
23.09.2022 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
23.09.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
23.09.2022 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
23.09.2022 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
23.09.2022 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
28.03.2022 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
23.02.2022 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
03.02.2022 Refund of fees Search / examination 2
31.01.2022 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.01.2022 European search opinion Search / examination 2
31.01.2022 European search report Search / examination 3
31.01.2022 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
21.01.2022 Search started Search / examination 1
05.08.2021 Claim deemed abandoned Search / examination 2
16.07.2021 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
02.07.2021 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
02.07.2021 Claims Search / examination 3
02.07.2021 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
29.06.2021 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
29.06.2021 Claims Search / examination 3
29.06.2021 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.05.2021 Invitation to pay claims fees Search / examination 2
09.03.2021 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.03.2021 Annex Search / examination 28
09.03.2021 Claims Search / examination 3
09.03.2021 Description Search / examination 24
09.03.2021 Drawings Search / examination 5
09.03.2021 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 9
04.07.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
04.07.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18