EP4086830 - COMPUTER-AIDED METHOD FOR PROVIDING PHYSICAL GOODS BASED ON REQUIREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FrontNow GmbH Zimmerstr. 94 10117 Berlin / DE | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lihotzky, Bernhard 80802 München / DE | 02 /
Funk, Marc-Sebastian 10115 Berlin / DE | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Reich, Jochen Herrnstraße 15 80539 München / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 21020243.8 | 02.05.2021 | [2022/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4086830 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08, G06Q50/28 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0833 (EP);
G06Q10/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COMPUTER UNTERSTÜTZTES VERFAHREN ZUM BEDARFSGERECHTEN BEREITSTELLEN PHYSISCHER WAREN | [2022/45] | English: | COMPUTER-AIDED METHOD FOR PROVIDING PHYSICAL GOODS BASED ON REQUIREMENTS | [2022/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ASSISTÉ PAR ORDINATEUR PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR EN FONCTION DES BESOINS DES MARCHANDISES PHYSIQUES | [2022/45] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 21.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 18.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP3262785 (SKUCHAIN INC [US]); | [A]WO2020023441 (TRUCKI LLC [US]); | [A]EP3651092 (UNIV CORUNA [ES]); | [A]US2020311666 (GRAY DOUGLAS BRADLEY [US], et al); | [A]WO2021050947 (AVERY DENNISON RETAIL INFORMATION SERVICES LLC [US]); |