EP4082403 - A BEVERAGE CUP AND SAUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kütahya Porselen Sanayi Anonim Sirketi Calca mah. Eskisehir Karayolu Blv. Kutahya Porselen 97/1 Merkez Kutahya / TR | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÖZGER, Fatih Kütahya 43100 / TR | [2023/05] | Representative(s) | Demirkiran, Hasan Kordinat Inovasyon ve Fikri Mulkiyet Yonetimi Ltd. Sti. Nispetiye Mah. Nispetiye Cad. No:6 K:2 Etiler Besiktas 34340 Istanbul / TR | [2024/44] | Application number, filing date | 21020640.5 | 15.12.2021 | [2022/44] | Priority number, date | TR20210007393 | 30.04.2021 Original published format: TR 202107393 | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4082403 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4082403 | Date: | 30.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47G19/22, A47G23/03 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
A47G19/2283 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] |
Former [2022/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GETRÄNKEBECHER UND UNTERTASSE | [2022/44] | English: | A BEVERAGE CUP AND SAUCER | [2022/44] | French: | TASSE ET SOUCOUPE | [2022/44] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 20.12.2022 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 25.01.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 27.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 27.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application was refused due to failure to designate an inventor | 27.12.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 27.12.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.01.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US899811 (STEWART DAVID ALEXANDER [NZ]) [A] 1* page 1, line 30 - line 78; figure - *; | [A]GB190914236 (GARDAM ALICE MAUD HANNAH [GB]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 23 - line 36; figure - * | by applicant | TR201109726U | TR19552014119 | TR20190013227 |