EP4201873 - METHOD AND APPARATUS TO GENERATE A HYDROGEN-RICH PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Air Liquide, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSSI, Umberto 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Sophia 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
ULBER, Dieter 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/26] | 01 /
ROSSI, Umberto 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
02 /
ULBER, Dieter 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Representative(s) | Air Liquide L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21020647.0 | 21.12.2021 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4201873 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP4201873 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/04, C01B3/38, B01J8/06 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
C01B3/047 (EP);
C01B3/38 (EP);
C01B3/382 (EP);
C01B2203/0233 (EP);
C01B2203/0244 (EP);
C01B2203/0277 (EP);
C01B2203/0816 (EP);
C01B2203/0844 (EP);
C01B2203/0877 (EP);
C01B2203/0883 (EP);
C01B2203/141 (EP);
C01B2203/1614 (EP);
C01B2203/82 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES WASSERSTOFFREICHEN PRODUKTS | [2023/26] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS TO GENERATE A HYDROGEN-RICH PRODUCT | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR GÉNÉRER UN PRODUIT RICHE EN HYDROGÈNE | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1469045 (AZOTE OFFICE NAT IND); | [XA]GB1329162 (VARTA AG); | [IA]US2004154223 (POWELL MICHAEL ROY [US], et al); | [XA]US2006112636 (CHELLAPPA ANAND [US], et al); | [AD]EP3028990 (WANNEMACHER GERHARD [DE]); | [IA]US2020398240 (JIANG LILONG [CN], et al) | by applicant | EP3028990 | EP3028990 |