EP3984929 - LOADING RAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hörmann Alkmaar BV Robbenkoog 20 1822 BB Alkmaar / NL | [2022/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stroet, Frank 1704 WL Heerhugowaard / NL | 02 /
Schut, Nicolaas Johan 1834 KP Sint Pancras / NL | [2022/16] | Representative(s) | Koomen, M.J.I. Kennemerstraatweg 35 1814 GB Alkmaar / NL | [2022/16] | Application number, filing date | 21075013.9 | 12.10.2021 | [2022/16] | Priority number, date | NL20201043820 | 14.10.2020 Original published format: NL 1043820 | [2022/16] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3984929 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65G69/28 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
B65G69/2829 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] |
Former [2022/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LADERAMPE | [2022/16] | English: | LOADING RAMP | [2022/16] | French: | RAMPE DE CHARGEMENT | [2022/16] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 19.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2073135 (ALTEN K) [X] 1 * claim 1 * * figures 1-6 * * page 1, line 1 - line 93 * * page 1, line 109 - page 3, line 29 * [Y] 7-10; | [Y]DE8437887U (UNKNOWN) [Y] 7-10 * claim 1 * * figures 1-6 ** page 1 - page 19 *; | [X]DE102020109838 (STERTIL BV [NL]) [X] 1-6 * claim 1 * * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0060] * |