EP3907496 - DETECTION DEVICE AND DETECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wistron Corporation 21F, No.88, Sec.1, Hsintai 5th Rd. Hsichih New Taipei City 22181 / TW | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsieh, Yi Fan 22181 Hsichih, New Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Chen, Yu-Lin 22181 Hsichih, New Taipei City / TW | 03 /
Chang, Yao-Tsung 22181 Hsichih, New Taipei City / TW | [2021/45] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2021/45] | Application number, filing date | 21150573.0 | 07.01.2021 | [2021/45] | Priority number, date | TW20200115198 | 07.05.2020 Original published format: TW 109115198 | [2021/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3907496 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
G01N21/645 (EP);
G01N21/64 (CN);
G01N21/6486 (US);
B01L7/52 (CN,US);
G01J3/26 (EP);
G01J3/4406 (EP);
B01L2300/18 (US);
G01N2021/6419 (EP);
G01N2021/6471 (EP);
G01N2201/0636 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] |
Former [2021/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND DETEKTIONSVERFAHREN | [2021/45] | English: | DETECTION DEVICE AND DETECTION METHOD | [2021/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION | [2021/45] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 30.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2005030545 (TUSCHEL DAVID [US], et al); | [Y]JP5775252B ; | [A]US2019137400 (NGUYEN THUC-UYEN [US]) |