Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.08.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
05.04.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
31.03.2023 | First examination report | |
23.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.11.2021 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
05.11.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
05.11.2021 | Change - designated states | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
08.10.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
06.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
08.01.2021 | Change - representative |