Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11892407 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2024 | B2 | US2021349029 | 11.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | TW109115198 | 07.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113624726 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | TW109115198 | 07.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3907496 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | TW109115198 | 07.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI780430B | 11.10.2022 | B | TW202142861 | 16.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | TW109115198 | 07.05.2020 |