Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022411510 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | US202217668969 | 10.02.2022 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | WO2016EP81286 | 15.12.2016 | US201916662399 | 24.10.2019 | US201815918699 | 12.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020115453 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | WO2016EP81286 | 15.12.2016 | US201916662399 | 24.10.2019 | US201815918699 | 12.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018215824 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | WO2016EP81286 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180087428 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | WO2016EP81286 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6923528B | Global Dossier | 18.08.2021 | B2 | JP2018538309 | 27.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | WO2016EP81286 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3390450 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2021 | B1 | EP3390450 | 24.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | WO2016EP81286 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108699148 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | WO2016EP81286 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3868785 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | EP16822423 | 15.12.2016 | WO2016EP81286 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1124141T | 27.05.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | WO2016EP81286 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3390450T | 01.03.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | WO2016EP81286 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2862395T | 07.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | WO2016EP81286 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20210445T | 25.06.2021 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | EP16822423 | 15.12.2016 | WO2016EP81286 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3390450T | 25.06.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | WO2016EP81286 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3390450T | 13.09.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | EP16822423 | 15.12.2016 | WO2016EP81286 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3390450T | 20.04.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS61958 | 30.07.2021 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | EP16822423 | 15.12.2016 | WO2016EP81286 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3390450T | 31.08.2021 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | EP16822423 | 15.12.2016 | WO2016EP81286 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017103003 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE053736T | 28.07.2021 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP16306537 | 22.11.2016 | EP15200281 | 15.12.2015 | Type | Earlier application | EP3390450 |