Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
10.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
05.04.2024 | First examination report | |
19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.01.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
20.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
20.01.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
20.01.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
11.01.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.06.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
13.01.2021 | Change - representative |