Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022222253 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21151432 | 13.01.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3144686 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21151432 | 13.01.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021290215 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21151432 | 13.01.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4030313 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21151432 | 13.01.2021 |