EP3855410 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR REDUCING CONTROLLER-PILOT REJECTION RATIOS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAZAWADA, Suresh HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 02 /
SONGA, Anil Kumar HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 03 /
DAVIS, Jonathan HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 04 /
VENKATASWAMY, Sadguni HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Peter Lawrence LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House, Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 21151674.5 | 14.01.2021 | [2021/30] | Priority number, date | IN202011003065 | 23.01.2020 Original published format: IN202011003065 | US202017099911 | 17.11.2020 Original published format: US202017099911 | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3855410 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/00, H04B7/185 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
G08G5/0021 (EP);
G08G5/0013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DES REGLER-PILOT-ZURÜCKWEISUNGSVERHÄLTNISSES | [2021/30] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR REDUCING CONTROLLER-PILOT REJECTION RATIOS | [2021/30] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉDUCTION DE TAUX DE REJET DE CONTRÔLEUR-PILOTE | [2021/30] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/27] | 18.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1947624 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0009] - [0013] - [0015] , [0018] , [0021] , [0022] , [0026] , [0028] , [0029] * * figures 2-5 *; | [A]US2016161283 (SHAMASUNDAR RAGHU [IN], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0016] , [0018] , [0025] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2008316057 (MCGUFFIN THOMAS F [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0011] , [0015] * |