EP3838061 - COSMETIC CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 05.03.2025 [2025/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Household & Health Care Ltd. Sinmunno 2-ga 58 Saemunan-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 110-783 / KR | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Se Woong 39 Baekbong-ro Heungdeok-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 361-290 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hyeon Jeong LG Household & Health Care Packaging Research Department 3rd Floor 765 2 sunhwan-ro, Heungdeok-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 361-290 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Hye Ryen LG Ganghwamun Bldg., 12th Floor 58 Saemunan-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 110-783 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Sang Wook 175 Gajeong-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-343 / KR | 05 /
JUNG, Jae Hong LG Gwanghwamun Bldg., 10th Floor 58 Saemunan-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 110-783 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Kyungwon LG Gwanghwamun Bldg., 10th Floor 58 Saemunan-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 110-783 / KR | 07 /
CHO, Ye Kyung LG Gwanghwamun Bldg., 10th Floor 58 Saemunan-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 110-783 / KR | 08 /
KIM, Sung-Tae LG Gwanghwamun Bldg., 10th Floor 58 Saemunan-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 110-783 / KR | 09 /
LEE, Guyong LG Gwanghwamun Bldg., 10th Floor 58 Saemunan-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 110-783 / KR | 10 /
KANG, Sungsoo 175 Gajeong-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-343 / KR | 11 /
ROH, In Hwan 3rd Floor 337 Bakdal-ro Manan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 430-849 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2021/25] | 01 /
OH, Se Woong 39 Baekbong-ro Heungdeok-gu Cheongju-si 361-290 Chungcheongbuk-do / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Hyeon Jeong LG Household & Health Care Packaging Research Department 3rd Floor 765 2 sunhwan-ro, Heungdeok-gu, Cheongju-si 361-290 Chungcheongbuk-do / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Hye Ryen LG Ganghwamun Bldg., 12th Floor 58 Saemunan-ro Jongno-gu 110-783 Seoul / KR | |||
04 /
PARK, Sang Wook 175 Gajeong-ro Yuseong-gu 305-343 Daejeon / KR | |||
05 /
JUNG, Jae Hong LG Gwanghwamun Bldg., 10th Floor 58 Saemunan-ro Jongno-gu 110-783 Seoul / KR | |||
06 /
KIM, Kyungwon LG Gwanghwamun Bldg., 10th Floor 58 Saemunan-ro Jongno-gu 110-783 Seoul / KR | |||
07 /
CHO, Ye Kyung LG Gwanghwamun Bldg., 10th Floor 58 Saemunan-ro Jongno-gu 110-783 Seoul / KR | |||
08 /
KIM, Sung-Tae LG Gwanghwamun Bldg., 10th Floor 58 Saemunan-ro Jongno-gu 110-783 Seoul / KR | |||
09 /
LEE, Guyong LG Gwanghwamun Bldg., 10th Floor 58 Saemunan-ro Jongno-gu 110-783 Seoul / KR | |||
10 /
KANG, Sungsoo 175 Gajeong-ro Yuseong-gu 305-343 Daejeon / KR | |||
11 /
ROH, In Hwan 3rd Floor 337 Bakdal-ro Manan-gu Anyang-si 430-849 Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 21151791.7 | 03.02.2015 | [2021/25] | Priority number, date | KR20140017013 | 14.02.2014 Original published format: KR 20140017013 | KR20140092736 | 22.07.2014 Original published format: KR 20140092736 | KR20140092737 | 22.07.2014 Original published format: KR 20140092737 | KR20140092738 | 22.07.2014 Original published format: KR 20140092738 | KR20140092739 | 22.07.2014 Original published format: KR 20140092739 | KR20140092740 | 22.07.2014 Original published format: KR 20140092740 | KR20140104488 | 12.08.2014 Original published format: KR 20140104488 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3838061 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3838061 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3838061 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/00, B65D47/34, B65D83/76, A45D33/02, A45D33/06 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
A45D33/006 (EP,CN,US);
A45D34/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A45D40/0075 (US);
A45D33/008 (EP,CN,US);
A45D33/02 (EP,US);
A45D33/06 (EP,CN,US);
A45D34/04 (KR);
A45D40/22 (US);
A45D40/26 (KR);
B05B11/1001 (US);
B65B11/00 (KR);
B65D47/00 (KR);
B65D47/06 (KR);
B65D83/00 (KR);
B65D83/76 (KR);
A45D2200/055 (EP,CN,US);
A45D2200/056 (EP,US);
A45D2200/1018 (EP,CN,US);
A45D2200/155 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] |
Former [2021/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOSMETIKBEHÄLTER | [2021/25] | English: | COSMETIC CONTAINER | [2021/25] | French: | RÉCIPIENT POUR PRODUIT COSMÉTIQUE | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 02.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15749026.9 / EP3106060 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | BG | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | GB | 03.02.2024 | IE | 03.02.2024 | LU | 03.02.2024 | BE | 29.02.2024 | CH | 29.02.2024 | [2025/10] |
Former [2025/09] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
BG | 06.09.2023 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
GB | 03.02.2024 | ||
LU | 03.02.2024 | ||
BE | 29.02.2024 | ||
CH | 29.02.2024 | ||
Former [2025/08] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
BG | 06.09.2023 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
LU | 03.02.2024 | ||
BE | 29.02.2024 | ||
CH | 29.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/51] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
BG | 06.09.2023 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
LU | 03.02.2024 | ||
CH | 29.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/48] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
LU | 03.02.2024 | ||
CH | 29.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/47] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
LU | 03.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/45] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01164922U ; | [A]JPH0523135Y ; | [A]KR200470757Y | by applicant | KR101355364B |