EP3862103 - PRESSURE WASHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Annovi Reverberi S.p.A. 3 Via Martin Luther King 41122 Modena / IT | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASALGRANDI, Alessandro 148, Via Liguria 41125 MODENA / IT | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42121 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 21152100.0 | 18.01.2021 | [2021/32] | Priority number, date | IT20200002509 | 10.02.2020 Original published format: IT202000002509 | [2021/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3862103 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3862103 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B08B3/02 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
B08B3/028 (EP);
B08B9/0321 (CN);
B05B12/00 (EP);
B05B9/0406 (EP);
B08B13/00 (CN);
B08B9/0325 (CN);
F04B23/04 (EP);
F04B49/02 (EP);
F04B49/06 (EP);
G05D16/20 (CN);
B05B12/002 (EP);
B08B2203/0223 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] |
Former [2021/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HOCHDRUCKREINIGER | [2021/32] | English: | PRESSURE WASHER | [2021/32] | French: | NETTOYEUR HAUTE PRESSION | [2021/32] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 26.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | CZ | 22.11.2023 | DK | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | MC | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SE | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | LU | 18.01.2024 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
MC | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SK | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SK | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1060800 (LAVORWASH S R L [IT]); | [A]US2010243086 (GILPATRICK RICHARD J [US]); | [A]ES1075101U (LAVORWASH SPA [IT]); | [A]CN204672602U (SUMEC HARDWARE & TOOLS CO LTD); | [A]EP2985083 (NILFISK ADVANCE AS [DK]); | [A]US2017122304 (FUNABASHI KAZUHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]EP3320989 (ANNOVI REVERBERI SPA [IT]); | [A]WO2018140753 (BRIGGS & STRATTON CORP [US]); | [A]US10130962 (DEY JOHN [US], et al) |