EP3828033 - LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TS Tech Co., Ltd. 7-27, Sakae-cho 3-chome Asaka-shi, Saitama 351-0012 / JP | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Masanori c/o TS TECH CO. LTD. 118-1 Oaza Ota Takanezawa-machi Shioya-gun, Tochigi 329-1217 / JP | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 21152159.6 | 31.01.2017 | [2021/22] | Priority number, date | JP20160020131 | 04.02.2016 Original published format: JP 2016020131 | JP20160020132 | 04.02.2016 Original published format: JP 2016020132 | [2021/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3828033 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3828033 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q3/217, F21V8/00, F21V17/00, G02B6/42, F21Y115/10 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
B60Q3/64 (EP);
B60Q3/217 (US);
B60Q3/51 (US);
B60Q3/54 (US);
B60Q3/62 (US);
B60Q3/78 (EP);
F21V17/00 (US);
G02B6/0006 (EP,US);
G02B6/42 (US);
G02B6/0008 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] |
Former [2021/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/22] | English: | LIGHTING DEVICE | [2021/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2021/22] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 29.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17747418.6 / EP3412507 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10206282 (ANDO ELECTRIC); | [A]US2003123836 (FUJISAWA MANABU [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007178884 (SUNX LTD); | [A]RU2337732 (FEDERAL NOE GUP 25 GNIN INST M [RU]); | [A]WO2009035776 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al); | [A]US2010329613 (CHILDERS DARRELL R [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2011121503 |