EP4029746 - ELECTRONICALLY CONTROLLED PROTECTION VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Polyak, Tibor 6044 Hetényegyháza / HU | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Marstallstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21152244.6 | 19.01.2021 | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029746 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60T11/32, B60T11/34, B60T13/66, B60T13/68, B60T17/00, B60T17/04, B60T17/22 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
B60T13/66 (EP);
B60T11/326 (EP);
B60T11/34 (EP);
B60T13/662 (EP);
B60T13/68 (EP);
B60T13/683 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCH GESTEUERTES SCHUTZVENTIL | [2022/29] | English: | ELECTRONICALLY CONTROLLED PROTECTION VALVE | [2022/29] | French: | SOUPAPE DE PROTECTION COMMANDÉE ÉLECTRONIQUEMENT | [2022/29] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/26] | 10.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2023/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9847751 (WABCO AUTOMOTIVE UK [GB], et al) [X] 1 * figure, valves 21-26 actuated via ECU 15, based on the pressure sensors 31 *; | [A]US7080891 (HILBERER EDUARD [DE]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [XI]EP2050596 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8,13,14 * figure 1, in particular valves 16 or 18, isolating the manifold 14 from the users 90, 92, etc based on the pressure signal detected by the element 72/74, sent to the ECU 84, actuating the valves themselves; see as well par. 13, 15, 16 and 22 * [I] 9-12; | [X]US2014021778 (BRYAR BARRY JOHN [AU]) [X] 1 * par. 62 to 64 and figures 3-7 in particular valve 24, inlet 20a, outlet 20b, p sensor 25, ECU 23 *; | [A]US8864247 (HILBERER EDUARD [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US8899598 (FRANK DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US9273700 (BERGEMANN KLAUS-DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US9347581 (DIEKMEYER HEINRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * figure 7 and in general pressure 16, ECU 10, actuating the supply control valve 12, inlet 28 and outlet 62 * | by applicant | DE102008063819 | DE102013000275 | DE102013110736 | DE102019100788 |